MA S1398 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2491
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to retirement benefits for care givers at the Soldiers' Homes. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for care givers at the Soldiers' Homes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-26 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2491 |
2017-10-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1429 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1430 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H2564
S1482 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1440 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1323 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3279 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4260
H1403 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
S1430 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H2564
S1482 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1440 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H1323 (Similar To) 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
H3279 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4260
H1403 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1398 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1398.pdf |