MA H4915 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Representative Murphy of Weymouth and Senator O'Connor, a joint petition of James M. Murphy, Patrick M. O'Connor and Ronald Mariano (with the approval of the mayor and town council) that the retirement board of the town of Weymouth be authorized to pay a certain retirement benefit to the surviving spouse of fallen officer Michael Chesna of the police department of said town. Public Service. [Local Approval Received.]

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing and directing the retirement board of the town of Weymouth to pay a certain retirement benefit to the surviving spouse of fallen officer, Michael Chesna, of the Weymouth Police Department

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-11HouseAmended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
2018-10-11HouseRead second, ordered to a third reading, rules suspended, read third (title changed)
2018-10-11HouseRules suspended
2018-10-11HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting
2018-10-11HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2018-10-03JointHearing scheduled for 10/09/2018 from 01:00 PM-02:00 PM in A-1
2018-09-24SenateSenate concurred
2018-09-20HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

H2531 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3279 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4260
H4928 (Similar To) 2018-11-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 289 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback