MA H1323 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4654
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-27 - Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to retirement benefits for Mary Donna Nodurf. Public Service.
Title
Relative to retirement benefits for Mary Donna Nodurf
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Sen. Eric Lesser [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | Discharged to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-27 | House | Reported on a part of H4654 |
2018-06-27 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
2018-06-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4654 |
2018-01-29 | House | Hearing held on 06/27/17 11:00 AM- 3:30PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service |
Same As/Similar To
S1429 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1430 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H2564
S1398 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1482 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1440 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H3279 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4260
H1403 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
S1430 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H2564
S1398 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S1482 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1440 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H3279 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4260
H1403 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1461 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3790 (Similar To) 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
H1436 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H3300 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H4654 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4915 (Similar To) 2018-10-11 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4928
H4933 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 406 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1323 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1323.pdf |