MA H3790 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Brodeur of Melrose, a petition (subject to Joint Rule 12) of Paul Brodeur that the Massport Employees’ Retirement System be directed to grant accidental disability retirement benefits to Jan Witkowski. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to accidental disability retirement for Jan Witkowski

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27 Signed by the Governor, Chapter 248 of the Acts of 2018
2018-09-17SenateEnacted and laid before the Governor
2018-09-17HouseEnacted
2018-09-17SenateEmergency preamble adopted
2018-09-17HouseEmergency preamble adopted
2018-09-13SenateRead third and passed to be engrossed
2018-09-13SenateTaken out of the Orders of the Day
2018-09-10SenateRead, rules suspended, read second and ordered to a third reading
2018-09-06HouseRead third, amended and passed to be engrossed
2018-06-14HouseRead second and ordered to a third reading
2018-04-02HouseCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
2018-02-28HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling
2017-07-07JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 02:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2017-06-29SenateSenate concurred
2017-06-26HouseReported, referred to the committee on Joint Rules, reported, rules suspended and referred to the Joint Committee on Public Service
2017-05-18HouseReferred to the committee on House Rules

Same As/Similar To

S1434 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Accompanied H1460
H1525 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1492 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H2627 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1625 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H1795 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1797 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4502
H1460 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3803 (Similar To) 2017-12-21 - Amended by substitution of a bill with the same title, H4088
H3457 (Similar To) 2017-12-28 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4101

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback