MA S2670 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-16 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating senior tax relief in the town of Carver.
Title
Creating senior tax relief in the town of Carver.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-16 | Signed by the Governor, Chapter 299 of the Acts of 2018 | |
2018-11-08 | Senate | Enacted and laid before the Governor |
2018-11-08 | House | Enacted |
2018-11-05 | House | Read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-22 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2018-10-22 | House | Rules suspended |
2018-10-22 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2018-10-18 | House | Read; and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading, read third and passed to be engrossed |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Substituted for S2619 |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Recommended new draft (Pacheco) for S2619 |
Same As/Similar To
H1638 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1631 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1632 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3336 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1598 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1631 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1632 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3336 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
S1598 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2670 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S2670.pdf |