MA S353 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2419

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to prevent patient abuse and death in nursing homes. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To prevent patient abuse and death in nursing homes

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-12SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2419
2017-08-23JointHearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S348 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S360 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
S361 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2419
H2076 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2890 (Similar To) 2018-07-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4787
H823 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2419 (Replaced by) 2018-05-03 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback