MA H1135 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4625

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

By Mr. Cantwell of Marshfield, a petition of James M. Cantwell and others that the Department of Public Health be directed to establish a positive social norms marketing public school grant program. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supporting school-based substance use prevention through evidenced-based positive social norms marketing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-18HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4625
2017-09-29JointHearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H132 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2413
H621 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1125 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1186 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4681
H1215 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1229 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H4048 (Similar To) 2017-11-27 - See H3827
H4625 (Replaced by) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback