MA H2845 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4678

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to substance abuse education in public schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to substance abuse education in public schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4678
2017-06-22JointHearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S254 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
H2853 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
S299 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
H2058 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3705
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H307 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H3556 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H2057 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4678 (Replaced by) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback