MA S1997 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2483

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to establish a distinctive registration plate supporting public schools. Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a distinctive registration plate supporting public schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2483
2018-01-24JointHearing scheduled for 01/24/18 from 10:00AM-12:00PM in A-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

S254 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S299 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
S251 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S303 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
H2058 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3705
H2037 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2853 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H307 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H3556 (Similar To) 2018-02-15 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2306
H2057 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2483 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback