MA H2037 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to public school transportation fees. Education.
Title
Relative to equalizing public school transportation fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2017-05-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
S254 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S299 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
H2058 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3705
S251 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2853 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H307 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2057 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4706 (Replaced by) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S254 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S299 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
H2058 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3705
S251 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2853 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H307 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2057 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4706 (Replaced by) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2037 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2037.pdf |