MA S303 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2424
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase substance abuse prevention and education in public schools. Education.
Title
To increase substance abuse prevention and education in public schools
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick O'Connor [R] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] | Rep. Sheila Harrington [R] | Sen. Donald Humason [R] |
Rep. James O'Day [D] | Rep. Linda Campbell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-17 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2424 |
2017-07-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 428 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S254 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2425
S299 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
S302 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S251 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H2058 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3705
H2037 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2853 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H307 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2057 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2424 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S299 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2426
S302 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S251 (Similar To) 2018-01-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1997 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H2058 (Similar To) 2017-05-18 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3705
H2037 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
H2853 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4685
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H314 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H307 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
H2057 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4723
H2024 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Accompanied a study order, see H4641
S2367 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2424 (Replaced by) 2018-05-07 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S303 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S303.pdf |