MA S582 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2403

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to limit retroactive denials of health insurance claims for mental health and substance abuse services. Financial Services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To limit retroactive denials of health insurance claims for mental health and substance abuse services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2403
2017-05-10JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in 222
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services

Same As/Similar To

S1113 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
H1075 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
S2403 (Replaced by) 2018-06-07 - Accompanied H4315

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback