MA H2193 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4315
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to limit retroactive denials of health insurance claims for mental health and substance abuse services. Financial Services.
Title
To limit retroactive denials of health insurance claims for mental health and substance abuse services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4315 |
2017-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in 222 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
S552 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1093 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2453
H2974 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
H1075 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H4315 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S552 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2496
S1093 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2453
H2974 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
H1075 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H4315 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2193 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2193.pdf |