MA H2393 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4557

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to substance abuse accountable care organizations. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to substance abuse accountable care organizations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4557
2017-05-02JointHearing scheduled for 05/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
S1085 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2508
S1082 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S302 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S761 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2394 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2214 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2405 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1075 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H1559 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
S2061 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Placed on file
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H2193 (Similar To) 2018-03-22 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4315
H4557 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback