MA H4557 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health, substance use, and recovery

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health, substance use, and recovery

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2018-06-04HouseOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules
2018-06-04HouseAccompanied by H1063, H1069, H1072, H1073, H1074, H2269, H2389, H2390, H2393, H2398, H2399, H2406, H2409, H2410, H2411, H2413, H3203, H3509 and H3510
2018-06-04HouseReported from the committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H1063 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H1069 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H1072 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H1073 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H1074 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2269 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2389 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2390 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2393 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2398 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2399 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2406 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2409 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2410 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2411 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2413 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H3203 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H3509 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H3510 (Replaces) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H4537 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4502 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4244 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Reported, in part, by H1595
H4530 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4527 (Similar To) 2018-05-23 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4591 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4590 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4585 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4610 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4625 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4632 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4641 (Similar To) 2018-06-20 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4672 (Similar To) 2018-06-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4685 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4678 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4706 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4723 (Similar To) 2018-07-10 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4740 (Similar To) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback