MA H4537 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 24 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relativerelative to transportation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-24HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2018-05-24HouseOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules
2018-05-24HouseAccompanied by H1795, H1802, H1814, H1816, H1835, H1836, H1838, H1839, H1855, H1869, H1870, H1885, H1887, H1889, H1907, H1910, H1911, H1912, H1914, H2720 and H2727
2018-05-24HouseReported from the committee on Transportation

Same As/Similar To

H1795 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1802 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1814 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1816 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1835 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1836 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1838 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1839 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1855 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1869 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1870 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1885 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1887 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1889 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1907 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1910 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1911 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1912 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1914 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H2720 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H2727 (Replaces) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
H1457 (Similar To) 2018-06-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4654
H1640 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Accompanied S1551
S1967 (Similar To) 2017-10-26 - New draft substituted, see S2193
H257 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4392
S1948 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2483
H4840 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H4861 (Similar To) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4891 (Similar To) 2018-10-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 256 of the Acts of 2018

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback