MA H1869 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4537
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4537
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to the use of road flaggers and police details on public works projects. Transportation.
Title
Relative to the use of road flaggers and police details on public works projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4537 |
2017-12-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/06/17 from 1:00PM-3:00PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S1477 (Similar To) 2018-03-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2004 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
H4537 (Replaced by) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S2004 (Similar To) 2018-02-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2277
H4537 (Replaced by) 2018-05-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1869 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1869.pdf |