MA H4861 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H1151
Note: Replaces legislation H3240

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on July 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to authorizing the committee on Public Health to make an investigation and study of certain House documents concerning public health

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-31HouseDischarged to the committee on House Rules
2018-07-31HouseOrder reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Joint Rules
2018-07-31HouseAccompanied by H1151 and H3240
2018-07-31HouseReported from the committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H1151 (Replaces) 2018-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4861
H3240 (Replaces) 2018-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4861
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
H1215 (Similar To) 2018-05-21 - Committee recommended bill ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S2648 (Similar To) 2018-08-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback