MA S1262 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2422
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Massachusetts Cemeteries Board of Oversight. Public Health.
Title
Establishing the Massachusetts Cemeteries Board of Oversight
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2422 |
2017-11-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1699 (Similar To) 2018-05-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4481
S618 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1501 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S405 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1271 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
H2385 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H621 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H101 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Accompanied S612
H132 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2413
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H2820 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
H1215 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
S618 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1501 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S405 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2489
S1271 (Similar To) 2018-03-19 - Accompanied S1218
H2385 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H621 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H101 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Accompanied S612
H132 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2413
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H2820 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
H1215 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
S2422 (Replaced by) 2018-04-19 - Reported (in part) by S1241
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1262 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S1262.pdf |