MA H101 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S612

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 91-4)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Accompanied S612
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the development of a common application portal for state-administered needs-based benefits and services. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improving public health through a common application for core food, health and safety-net programs

Sponsors

Rep. Jay Livingstone [D]Rep. Evandro Carvalho [D]Rep. James Cantwell [D]Rep. Tackey Chan [D]
Sen. Jason Lewis [D]Rep. Daniel Donahue [D]Rep. Ann-Margaret Ferrante [D]Rep. Denise Provost [D]
Rep. Robert Koczera [D]Rep. Frank Smizik [D]Rep. Danielle Gregoire [D]Rep. Jack Lewis [D]
Rep. Tricia Farley-Bouvier [D]Rep. Paul Donato [D]Rep. William Galvin [D]Rep. Jennifer Benson [D]
Rep. Daniel Cahill [D]Rep. Mike Connolly [D]Rep. James Miceli [D]Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D]
Rep. Frank Moran [D]Rep. Adrian Madaro [D]Rep. Aaron Vega [D]Rep. Lori Ehrlich [D]
Rep. Marjorie Decker [D]Rep. Christine Barber [D]Rep. John Scibak [D]Rep. David Rogers [D]
Rep. James O'Day [D]Sen. Barbara L'Italien [D]Rep. Michael Finn [D]Rep. Thomas Calter [D]
Rep. Brian Ashe [D]Rep. Chynah Tyler [D]Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D]Rep. Gerard Cassidy [D]
Rep. Kay Khan [D]Rep. Jay Kaufman [D]Rep. Chris Walsh [D]Rep. Paul Heroux [D]
Sen. James Eldridge [D]Rep. Elizabeth Malia [D]Rep. Ruth Balser [D]Rep. Rady Mom [D]
Rep. Natalie Higgins [D]Rep. Angelo Puppolo [D]Rep. Carmine Gentile [D]Rep. William Straus [D]
Rep. Bud Williams [D]Rep. John Mahoney [D]Rep. Antonio Cabral [D]Rep. Solomon Goldstein-Rose [D]
Rep. Paul Schmid [D]Sen. Joan Lovely [D]Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D]Rep. Josh Cutler [D]
Sen. Brendan Crighton [D]Rep. Kevin Honan [D]Rep. Alan Silvia [D]Rep. Daniel Ryan [D]
Rep. Stephen Kulik [D]Rep. Juana Matias [D]Rep. David Nangle [D]Rep. Carlos Gonzalez [D]
Rep. Michelle Dubois [D]Rep. Jonathan Hecht [D]Rep. Mary Keefe [D]Rep. Paul Mark [D]
Rep. Daniel Hunt [D]Rep. Gailanne Cariddi [D]Rep. Michael Day [D]Rep. William Driscoll [D]
Rep. Jonathan Zlotnik [D]Sen. Eileen Donoghue [D]Rep. Paul Tucker [D]Rep. Peter Kocot [D]
Rep. Sean Garballey [D]Rep. Todd Smola [R]Sen. Michael Moore [D]Sen. Salvatore DiDomenico [D]
Rep. William Pignatelli [D]Rep. Susannah Whipps Lee [R]Rep. Edward Coppinger [D]Sen. Patricia Jehlen [D]
Rep. Jose Tosado [D]Sen. Ryan Fattman [R]Rep. John Velis [D]Rep. Paul McMurtry [D]
Sen. Nick Collins [D]Rep. Byron Rushing [D]Rep. James Arciero [D]Rep. Steven Ultrino [D]
Rep. Bradford Hill [R]Rep. Diana DiZoglio [D]Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-29SenateAccompanied S612
2018-04-26SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-24HouseReporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-03-01HouseHouse concurred
2018-03-01SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-07-13HouseReported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2017-05-08JointHearing scheduled for 05/16/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities

Same As/Similar To

S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
S631 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S638 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S2159 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H4048 (Similar To) 2017-11-27 - See H3827
S612 (Replaced by) 2018-05-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback