MA S631 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to utilize public health benefits by large employers. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to the utilization of public health benefits by large employers
Sponsors
Sen. John Keenan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-05-21 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday June 13, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2017-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-1 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S142 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
S638 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
H2990 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H595 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2211 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
S638 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
H2990 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H595 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2211 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S631 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S631.pdf |