MA S142 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4454

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to graduate education for certain professionals. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to graduate education for certain professionals

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseAccompanied a new draft, see H4454
2018-04-17SenateSenate concurred
2018-04-11HouseAmendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday, May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
2018-03-12SenateReporting date extended to Thursday, March 22, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07HouseHouse concurred
2018-02-07SenateReporting date extended to Wednesday March 7, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-10-17JointHearing scheduled for 10/24/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2
2017-10-10HouseHouse concurred
2017-10-05SenateDischarged to the Joint Committee on Public Health
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

S702 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S631 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S694 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S638 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S1577 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S1262 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a study order, see S2422
S784 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - New draft substituted, see S2260
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H637 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H2820 (Similar To) 2018-05-03 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4454
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
S2159 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - House concurred
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H3776 (Similar To) 2017-07-17 - Reported by H3818
H4048 (Similar To) 2017-11-27 - See H3827
H4454 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2648 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback