MA H648 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2081

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to require post secondary institutions to inform students of their right to call their parents and their right to an attorney in the event of a disciplinary hearing that may result in expulsion. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to student’s rights in higher education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2081
2017-03-27JointHearing scheduled for 04/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H630 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S2081 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback