MA S2081 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H630
Note: Legislation replaced by S2191

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislationfor legislationfor legislationfor legislation to require post secondary institutions to inform students of their right to call their parents and their right to an attorney in the event of a disciplinary hearing that may result in expulsion,- reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2081).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sexual violence on higher education campuses

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-02SenateNew draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
2017-11-02SenateRead second
2017-10-26SenatePostponed to Thursday, November 2, 2017
2017-10-26SenateOrder relative to subject matter adopted
2017-10-26SenateBills in the Third Reading amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2191
2017-10-26SenateRead third
2017-07-24SenateRead second and ordered to a third reading
2017-07-24SenateRules suspended
2017-07-24SenateBill reported favorably by committee
2017-06-08SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2017-06-08SenateNew draft of H630, H632, H648, S697 and S706
2017-06-08SenateReported from the committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H630 (Replaces) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H632 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S2191 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Reprinted as amended, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback