MA S706 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2081

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-5)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to sexual violence on higher education campuses. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sexual violence on higher education campuses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-08SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2081
2017-03-27JointHearing scheduled for 04/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

S707 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1174 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Senate concurred
S702 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H632 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H2998 (Similar To) 2018-01-31 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4159
H2997 (Similar To) 2017-05-30 - Hearing scheduled for 06/29/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
S2081 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
S2191 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - Reprinted as amended, see S2203
S2203 (Similar To) 2017-11-06 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H933 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback