MA S702 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2468

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2468
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to strengthen and expand higher education opportunities. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to strengthening and expanding higher education opportunities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateAccompanied a new draft, see S2468
2017-09-22JointHearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Westfield State University
2017-08-30JointHearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Leominster High School
2017-06-26JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H2868 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H634 (Similar To) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4286
H640 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2134 (Similar To) 2017-07-27 - See H3740
H4286 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2468 (Replaced by) 2018-04-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback