MA H640 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2225
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to higher education opportunities for residents of the Commonwealth. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to strengthening and expanding affordable, quality higher education opportunities for residents of the Commonwealth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-03-06 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Bonding, Capital Expenditures and State Assets |
2018-03-06 | House | Accompanied by H2225 |
2017-09-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/02/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Westfield State University |
2017-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Leominster High School |
2017-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H2233 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H41 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2225 (Replaces) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied H640
S2380 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S2421
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S2631 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 296 of the Acts of 2018
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
H239 (Similar To) 2018-07-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4716
H265 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4390
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H2233 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H2083 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H330 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4394
H228 (Similar To) 2018-06-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4632
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H41 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2225 (Replaces) 2018-03-06 - Accompanied H640
S2380 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S2421
S2390 (Similar To) 2018-05-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2527
S2631 (Similar To) 2018-11-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 296 of the Acts of 2018
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H640 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H640.pdf |