MA H2225 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H640
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Accompanied H640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Accompanied H640
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to direct the Massachusetts Educational Financing Authority to establish a college savings program for each eligible child born and issued a birth certificate in the Commonwealth. Higher Education.
Title
Creating a child savings program
Sponsors
Rep. Sean Garballey [D] | Sen. Brendan Crighton [D] | Rep. Thomas Stanley [D] | Rep. Marjorie Decker [D] |
Rep. Daniel Cullinane [D] | Rep. Robert Koczera [D] | Rep. David Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Accompanied H640 |
2017-08-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/11/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Leominster High School |
2017-06-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:30 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
S684 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S707 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S712 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H3491 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1582 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H640 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S707 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S712 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H3491 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H1582 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H640 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2225 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H2225.pdf |