MA H12 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

So much of the recommendations of the Inspector General (House, No. 11) as relates to higher education boards of trustees. Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to higher education boards and trustees

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-01HouseNo further action taken
2017-10-04HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2017-05-30JointHearing scheduled for 06/29/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education

Same As/Similar To

H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S1383 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H1920 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4376
S680 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2247
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H637 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback