MA S1383 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S2491

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to part-time higher education faculty eligibility in the state retirement system. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to part-time higher education faculty eligibility in the state retirement system

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26SenateAccompanied a study order, see S2491
2018-01-17JointHearing scheduled for 01/23/2018 from 11:30 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
2017-01-23HouseHouse concurred
2017-01-23SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Same As/Similar To

S1533 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
S688 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S1025 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2491
S706 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
S669 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S680 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - New draft substituted, see S2247
S677 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
S668 (Similar To) 2018-04-26 - Accompanied a study order, see S2487
H648 (Similar To) 2017-06-08 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2081
H1920 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4376
H636 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
H637 (Similar To) 2018-06-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4610
S2081 (Similar To) 2017-11-02 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2191
H12 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S2491 (Replaced by) 2018-05-14 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback