MA H1151 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4861

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - Accompanied a study order, see H4861
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to regulating the practice and licensure of lactation consultants. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulating the practice and licensure of lactation consultants

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-31HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4861
2018-07-12SenateSenate concurred
2018-07-11HouseReporting date extended to Tuesday July 31, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-05-17SenateSenate concurred
2018-05-14HouseReporting date extended to Friday July 13, 2018, pending concurrence
2018-02-07SenateSenate concurred
2018-02-07HouseAmendment (changing reporting date to Wednesday May 9, 2018) adopted, pending concurrence
2018-02-07HouseReporting date extended to Saturday June 30, 2018, pending concurrence
2017-10-30JointHearing scheduled for 11/07/2017 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health

Same As/Similar To

H4861 (Replaced by) 2018-07-31 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback