MA H3203 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4557

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to patient centered access to behavioral health services in accountable care organizations. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to patient centered access to behavioral health services in accountable care organizations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4557
2017-05-30JointHearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H2393 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2399 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
S625 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
H2217 (Similar To) 2018-06-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4605
H4557 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback