MA H2409 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4557

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the providing of advise to clients of the right to counsel by certain mental health facilities. Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifying that a facility shall advise clients of right to counsel

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4557
2017-07-06JointHearing rescheduled to 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2
2017-07-05JointHearing scheduled for 07/11/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in 222
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Mental Health, Substance Use and Recovery

Same As/Similar To

H110 (Similar To) 2017-07-12 - Hearing scheduled for 07/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
H927 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
H1442 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/09/2017 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H800 (Similar To) 2017-05-01 - Hearing scheduled for 05/15/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2
S1638 (Similar To) 2018-04-30 - Accompanied a study order, see S2497
H3208 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H709 (Similar To) 2017-06-05 - Hearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium
H3700 (Similar To) 2018-02-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4252
H1390 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Bills in the Third Reading
H1414 (Similar To) 2017-10-24 - Hearing scheduled for 10/31/2017 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-2
S2380 (Similar To) 2018-04-11 - Reprinted as amended, see S2421
H4557 (Replaced by) 2018-06-04 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4556 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - See H1390

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback