MA S2061 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Placed on file
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to forming a special

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a Special Senate committee on addiction prevention, treatment and recovery

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on file
2017-05-03SenateAmendment #1 (Tarr) adopted

Same As/Similar To

S2060 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Again adopted and placed on file
S6 (Similar To) 2017-01-04 - Adopted
S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
H2845 (Similar To) 2017-06-22 - Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2017 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
H2393 (Similar To) 2017-05-02 - Hearing scheduled for 05/08/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-1
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-02-07 - Senate concurred
H1135 (Similar To) 2017-09-29 - Hearing scheduled for 10/17/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback