MA S761 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2170
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation relative to judicial relief for substance abuse through diversion. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to judicial relief for substance abuse through diversion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-02 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2170 |
2017-06-05 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2017-05-26 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/05/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 & A-2 |
2017-01-23 | House | House concurred |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S582 (Similar To) 2018-04-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2403
S302 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S303 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S1082 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1085 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2508
S1115 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
H2393 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2394 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2214 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2405 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1559 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
S2061 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Placed on file
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
S302 (Similar To) 2018-04-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2385
S303 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2424
S1082 (Similar To) 2018-02-05 - Bill reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1085 (Similar To) 2018-05-07 - Accompanied a study order, see S2508
S1115 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2439
H2393 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H3510 (Similar To) 2018-06-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4557
H2394 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2214 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H2392 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H2405 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1559 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4244
H2845 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4678
S2061 (Similar To) 2017-05-03 - Placed on file
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
S2170 (Replaced by) 2017-11-02 - Ways and Means amendment adopted, as amended, see S2185
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S761 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/S761.pdf |