MA H2267 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H4874

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to the reporting of neglect or abuse by mandated reporters. The Judiciary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the mandated reporter law

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09HouseAccompanied a study order, see H4874
2017-11-16JointHearing scheduled for 11/28/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

H77 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4491
H76 (Similar To) 2018-05-29 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H4874 (Replaced by) 2018-08-09 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback