MA H345 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relative to establishing multi-disciplinary teams with district attorneys to investigate elder abuse. Elder Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to establishing multi-disciplinary teams with district attorneys to investigate elder abuse

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-01HouseNo further action taken
2018-04-04HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2017-09-27JointHearing scheduled for 10/11/2017 from 02:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1
2017-01-23SenateSenate concurred
2017-01-23HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H339 (Similar To) 2018-05-14 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4494
H891 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4494 (Similar To) 2018-12-31 - Emergency preamble adopted

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback