MA S1500 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2692
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2692
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a special commission to find the best practices to promote education, awareness, and prevention of Lyme disease. Public Health.
Title
Establishing a special commission to find the best practices to promote education, awareness, and prevention of Lyme disease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Accompanied a study order, see S2692 |
2021-11-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2525 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1271 (Similar To) 2022-10-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H5201
S2495 (Similar To) 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
S2497 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - New Draft substituted, see S2561
S2502 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
H4016 (Similar To) 2021-09-30 - Chapter 74 of the Acts of 2021
S2516 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2525 (Similar To) 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, see S2557
S789 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S790 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
S791 (Similar To) 2022-06-09 - Accompanied a study order, see S2917
H3725 (Similar To) 2022-01-21 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 8 of the Acts of 2022
S823 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2714
H561 (Similar To) 2022-08-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H5136
S849 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S850 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S320 (Similar To) 2022-05-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2883
S322 (Similar To) 2022-03-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2756
S2692 (Replaced by) 2022-02-17 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1500 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1500.pdf |