CA SB982 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 490.4 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: organized theft.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB982 Wahab et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB982 Wahab et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-07-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b)(1) suspended. |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (June 19). |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-11 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4133.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3966.) (May 16). |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3283.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | March 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Set for hearing March 19. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 490.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |