MA S790 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by S771

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-11-17 - Accompanied S771
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to define modest meals and refreshments in prescriber education settings. Health Care Financing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To define modest meals and refreshments in prescriber education settings

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-11-17SenateAccompanied S771
2021-06-29JointHearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing

Same As/Similar To

S1603 (Similar To) 2021-07-15 - Hearing scheduled for 07/21/2021 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S813 (Similar To) 2021-10-28 - Hearing scheduled for 11/09/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1450 (Similar To) 2021-10-27 - Hearing scheduled for 11/03/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2013 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Accompanied a study order, see S2620
H4253 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Published as amended, see H4262
S771 (Replaced by) 2021-11-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback