MA S5 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Legislation replaced by H86

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on May 10 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

The following proposal (see Senate, No. 5 of 2021), having received, in joint session, the affirmative votes of a majority of all members elected to the preceding General Court [see House, No. 86 of 2019], has been referred, in accordance with Article XLVIII of the Amendments to the Constitution, to the present General Court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution to provide resources for education and transportation through an additional tax on incomes in excess of one million dollars

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Question on again agreeing to the Amendment Roll Call #48 (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09SenateAmendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
2021-06-09SenateRead
2021-05-12JointJoint session held and recessed to Wednesday, June 9, 2021
2021-05-10JointPlaced on the calendar for the Joint Session
2021-05-10JointSee H86 of the 2019
2021-05-10JointProposal taken from the files of the preceding General Court

Same As/Similar To

H86 (Replaced by) 2021-10-25 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, April 11, 2022
S2440 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Joint session held and recessed to Monday, April 11, 2022
H2932 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S16 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2980 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2021 from 03:00 PM-05:00 PM in Written Testimony Only
S2402 (Similar To) 2022-01-04 - Hearing scheduled for 01/10/2022 from 11:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1842 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2887 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S20 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - Hearing rescheduled to 01/25/2022 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1858 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/04/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1916 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/28/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1968 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S25 (Similar To) 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
H2946 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H2871 (Similar To) 2021-12-14 - Hearing scheduled for 12/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback