MA S1968 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5250
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to exempt active duty military personnel from state income tax while based out of state. Revenue.
Title
Relative to exempting active duty military personnel from state income tax while based out of state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-03 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5250 |
2021-12-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/12/2022 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | House concurred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on Revenue |
Same As/Similar To
S5 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Amendment again agreed to - see Senate Roll Call #48 and House Roll Call #38 (Yeas 159 to Nays 41)
H2932 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1841 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H2932 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H2980 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
H2982 (Similar To) 2022-10-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5250
S1842 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H2887 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
H2987 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S1858 (Similar To) 2022-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4894
S1916 (Similar To) 2022-04-14 - Accompanied H2915
S1841 (Similar To) 2022-07-11 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4997
H5250 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1968 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S1968.pdf |