NH SB327 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0278; Effective 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-30 - Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0278; Effective 01/01/2025
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing penalties for the assault or harassment of sports officials.
Title
Providing penalties for the assault or harassment of sports officials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-30 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/26/2024; Chapter 0278; Effective 01/01/2025 |
2024-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 |
2024-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2024; Senate Journal 16 |
2024-05-02 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1449h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 16 |
2024-05-02 | House | Amendment # 2024-1449h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2024 House Journal 12 P. 16 |
2024-04-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1449h 04/10/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 17 P. 12 |
2024-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 04/10/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-03-13 | House | Public Hearing: 03/20/2024 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-03-12 | House | Introduced 03/07/2024 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 7 P. 110 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/07/2024; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/07/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing: 01/23/2024, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2023-12-08 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |