NH SB357 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
Pending: House Health, Human Services & Elderly Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 10:00 am in Legislative Office Building 210-211
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to expanding the definition of providers who can certify patients of the therapeutic cannabis program.
Title
Relative to expanding the definition of providers who can certify patients of the therapeutic cannabis program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 05/01/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-04-10 | House | Public Hearing: 04/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-04-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/28/2024 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 10 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0994s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2024-0994s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/21/2024; Senate Journal 7 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-0994s, 03/21/2024, Vote 4-1; Senate Calendar 11 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/11/2024, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 2 |
2023-12-11 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 1 |