MA S20 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed on file, in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the subject matter of initiative petitions. The Judiciary.
Title
Proposal for a legislative amendment to the Constitution relative to the subject matter of initiative petitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on file, in concurrence |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Proposal for Constitutional Amendment reported adversely by committee and placed on file |
2021-03-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/06/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-02-22 | House | House concurred |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S20 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S20.pdf |