MA S2502 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Note: Replaces legislation S2429
Note: Legislation replaced by S2558

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-10-1-1)
Status: Introduced on July 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-10-21 - New draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislationfor legislation relative to military spouse-licensure portability, education and enrollment of dependents; of Linda Dean Campbell and others relative to military spouse licensure portability, education and enrollment of dependents; and of Thomas M. Stanley and others relative to military spouse-licensure portability, education and enrollment of dependents, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2502).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to military spouse-licensure portability, education and enrollment of dependents

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-21SenateNew draft substituted, as amended, see S2558
2021-10-21SenateRead second
2021-10-18SenateCommittee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, October 21, 2021
2021-10-14SenateReferred to the committee on Senate Rules
2021-10-14SenateCommittee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting a new draft, see S2558
2021-07-26SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
2021-07-26SenateNew draft of S2429, S2433, H3648 and H3697
2021-07-26SenateReported from the committee on Veterans and Federal Affairs

Same As/Similar To

S2429 (Replaces) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2502
H3697 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2502
S2433 (Similar To) 2021-07-26 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2502
S2410 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H3642 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing rescheduled to 09/24/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S2558 (Replaced by) 2021-10-21 - Reprinted, as amended, see S2559
S2559 (Similar To) 2021-10-25 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback