MA S2516 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on August 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Senate receded from its referral to the committee on Public Health and concurred in the referral to the committee on Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to mitigate COVID-19 transmission among children and families. Public Health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mitigating COVID-19 transmission among children and families

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-09SenateSenate receded from its referral to the committee on Public Health and concurred in the referral to the committee on Education
2021-09-09SenateRules suspended
2021-08-26HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Education
2021-08-26HouseHouse NON-concurred in the reference
2021-08-26HouseRules suspended
2021-08-09SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Health
2021-08-09SenateRules suspended
2021-08-05SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently

Same As/Similar To

H4110 (Similar To) 2021-10-13 - Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1464 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S383 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1247 (Similar To) 2021-06-29 - Hearing scheduled for 07/13/2021 from 10:30 AM-04:30 PM in Virtual Hearing
S357 (Similar To) 2021-06-24 - Hearing scheduled for 07/06/2021 from 12:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1462 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Hearing scheduled for 05/03/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
H538 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S353 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S217 (Similar To) 2021-07-27 - Hearing scheduled for 08/02/2021 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S371 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S332 (Similar To) 2021-07-21 - Accompanied H653
S315 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
S87 (Similar To) 2021-11-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-06-09 - Hearing scheduled for 06/22/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S98 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Hearing scheduled for 11/15/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S99 (Similar To) 2021-06-23 - Hearing scheduled for 07/07/2021 from 09:30 AM-01:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S322 (Similar To) 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S323 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback