MA S2495 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S318
Note: Legislation replaced by S2534
Note: Legislation replaced by S2534
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 92-1-1)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-09-23 - New draft substituted, see S2534
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislationfor legislation to authorize a consent program to prevent and reduce the incidence of sexual assault; and of James J. O'Day, Vanna Howard and others relative to public schools choosing to teach human sexual education or human sexuality issues, reports the accompanying bill (Senate, No. 2495).
Title
Relative to healthy youth
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Senate | New draft substituted, see S2534 |
2021-09-23 | Senate | Read second |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday September 23, 2021 |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Referred to the committee on Senate Rules |
2021-09-20 | Senate | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefore a new draft, see S2534 |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means |
2021-07-19 | Senate | New draft of S318, H615 and H673 |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Reported from the committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
S318 (Replaces) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2495
H673 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2495
S2534 (Replaced by) 2021-09-23 - Reprinted as amended, see S2541
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H673 (Similar To) 2021-07-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2495
S2534 (Replaced by) 2021-09-23 - Reprinted as amended, see S2541
S2541 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2495 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/S2495.pdf |