MA S322 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-09-03 - Hearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
Pending: Joint Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation relative to substance abuse education in public schools. Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to substance use education in public schools

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-03JointHearing scheduled for 09/13/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
2021-03-29HouseHouse concurred
2021-03-29SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Education

Same As/Similar To

S323 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S324 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S327 (Similar To) 2021-06-07 - Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2021 from 10:00 AM-04:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1421 (Similar To) 2021-11-02 - Hearing scheduled for 11/10/2021 from 09:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S1382 (Similar To) 2021-12-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S338 (Similar To) 2021-10-08 - Hearing scheduled for 10/18/2021 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing
S370 (Similar To) 2021-09-13 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2525

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback