MA S105 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court

Note: Replaces legislation H304

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

For legislation to provide for provisional licensure for speech-language pathologists. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for provisional licensure for speech-language pathologists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22HouseReporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-04-30SenateSenate concurred
2020-04-29HouseReporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence
2020-03-26SenateSenate concurred
2020-03-23HouseReporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence
2019-09-09SenateBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
2019-09-09SenateAccompanied by H304
2019-05-07JointHearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
2019-01-22HouseHouse concurred
2019-01-22SenateReferred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure

Same As/Similar To

H346 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Hearing scheduled for 06/24/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H3082 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S2142 (Similar To) 2019-10-31 - Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2019 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2
S526 (Similar To) 2019-07-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H40 (Similar To) 2020-01-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4305
S186 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - New draft substituted, see S2212
H251 (Similar To) 2019-06-04 - Hearing scheduled for 06/10/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2
H292 (Similar To) 2019-09-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H3795
S2212 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 12 of the Acts of 2019
H3747 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4334
H3821 (Similar To) 2020-02-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4402
H3847 (Similar To) 2019-08-09 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 57 of the Acts of 2019
H3864 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4085
H3967 (Similar To) 2019-09-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4086
H3992 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance
H3991 (Similar To) 2019-10-24 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H304 (Replaces) 2019-09-09 - Accompanied S105
S2381 (Similar To) 2020-03-25 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 46 of the Acts of 2020
H4197 (Similar To) 2020-06-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4809
H4270 (Similar To) 2020-01-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4340
H4271 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting, the question being on acceptance

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback